Senate | 03/27/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 714 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 684 | |
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/15/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 546 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 167 | |
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 167 | |
Senate | 12/19/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/19/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |