Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB368 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Garcia S.B. No. 368
 (In the Senate - Filed December 20, 2016; February 1, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 23, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 23, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of automotive wrecking and salvage yards
 in certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 397.0125(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In addition to the penalty provided by Section 397.012,
 a person who operates an automotive wrecking and salvage yard in
 violation of this chapter is liable for a civil penalty of not less
 than $500 or more than $5,000 [$1,000] for each violation.  A
 separate penalty may be imposed for each day a continuing violation
 occurs.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a violation of Chapter 397, Transportation Code, that occurs on
 or after the effective date of this Act. A violation of that
 chapter that occurred before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect when the violation occurred, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *