Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB379 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Perry S.B. No. 379
 (In the Senate - Filed December 20, 2016; February 1, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 12, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 12, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 379 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to eminent domain reporting requirements for certain
 entities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2206.154, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (b-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsections [Subsection] (b) and
 (b-1), not later than February 1 of each year, an entity described
 by Section 2206.151 shall submit to the comptroller a report
 containing records and other information specified by this
 subchapter for the purpose of providing the comptroller with
 information to maintain the eminent domain database under Section
 2206.153.  The entity shall submit the report in a form and in the
 manner prescribed by the comptroller.
 (b-1)  A public school district located in a county with a
 population of less than 25,000 is required to file an annual report
 under Subsection (a) only if the district's eminent domain
 authority information has changed from the information reported in
 the most recent report filed by the district under this section. If
 for the current annual reporting period the district's eminent
 domain authority information is the same as the information
 reflected for the district in the eminent domain database for the
 previous annual reporting period, the district, not later than
 February 1 of the current annual reporting period, shall confirm
 the accuracy of the information by electronically updating the
 district's previously filed report with the comptroller in the
 manner prescribed by the comptroller.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *