House | 04/13/2017 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 1508 | |
House | 04/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1508 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1086 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 895 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 836 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 684 | |
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 170 | |
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 170 | |
Senate | 12/21/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/21/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |