House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4004
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3482
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 3484
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3484
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2508
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1732
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1629
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1629
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1629
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1629
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1629
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1629
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1629
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1261
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2017
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 170
|
Senate
|
02/01/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 170
|
Senate
|
12/21/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/21/2016
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|