2 | | - | (In the Senate - Filed December 21, 2016; February 1, 2017, |
---|
3 | | - | read first time and referred to Committee on Administration; |
---|
4 | | - | April 6, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, |
---|
5 | | - | Nays 0; April 6, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
7 | 2 | | |
---|
8 | 3 | | |
---|
9 | 4 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 5 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 6 | | relating to a study conducted by the State Auditor's Office to |
---|
12 | 7 | | compare the projected cost estimate attached to certain bills and |
---|
13 | 8 | | resolutions to the actual cost to the state of the bills and |
---|
14 | 9 | | resolutions. |
---|
15 | 10 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
16 | 11 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 321, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
17 | 12 | | adding Section 321.0139 to read as follows: |
---|
18 | 13 | | Sec. 321.0139. STUDY ON ACTUAL COST OF BILLS AND |
---|
19 | 14 | | RESOLUTIONS. (a) The State Auditor shall conduct a study to |
---|
20 | 15 | | compare the probable cost estimate in fiscal notes prepared by the |
---|
21 | 16 | | Legislative Budget Board and attached to bills or resolutions in |
---|
22 | 17 | | accordance with Chapter 314 with the actual cost to the state of the |
---|
23 | 18 | | bills or resolutions. |
---|
24 | 19 | | (b) In conducting the study under this section, the State |
---|
25 | 20 | | Auditor shall: |
---|
26 | 21 | | (1) select for cost comparison a random sample set |
---|
27 | 22 | | consisting of 10 percent of fiscal notes prepared by the |
---|
28 | 23 | | Legislative Budget Board from the preceding five regular |
---|
29 | 24 | | legislative sessions that: |
---|
30 | 25 | | (A) projected a cost to the state; and |
---|
31 | 26 | | (B) were attached to bills or resolutions that |
---|
32 | 27 | | took effect; and |
---|
33 | 28 | | (2) develop a system to determine the actual cost to |
---|
34 | 29 | | the state associated with a bill or resolution that took effect. |
---|
35 | 30 | | (c) Not later than September 1, 2018, the State Auditor |
---|
36 | 31 | | shall deliver the results of the study conducted under this section |
---|
37 | 32 | | to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house |
---|
38 | 33 | | of representatives, the House Appropriations Committee, and the |
---|
39 | 34 | | Senate Finance Committee. |
---|
40 | 35 | | (d) This section expires December 31, 2018. |
---|
41 | 36 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
42 | 37 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
43 | 38 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
44 | 39 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
45 | 40 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|