Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB398 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 398
 (In the Senate - Filed December 21, 2016; February 1, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Administration;
 April 6, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 6, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study conducted by the State Auditor's Office to
 compare the projected cost estimate attached to certain bills and
 resolutions to the actual cost to the state of the bills and
 resolutions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 321, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 321.0139 to read as follows:
 Sec. 321.0139.  STUDY ON ACTUAL COST OF BILLS AND
 RESOLUTIONS. (a)  The State Auditor shall conduct a study to
 compare the probable cost estimate in fiscal notes prepared by the
 Legislative Budget Board and attached to bills or resolutions in
 accordance with Chapter 314 with the actual cost to the state of the
 bills or resolutions.
 (b)  In conducting the study under this section, the State
 Auditor shall:
 (1)  select for cost comparison a random sample set
 consisting of 10 percent of fiscal notes prepared by the
 Legislative Budget Board from the preceding five regular
 legislative sessions that:
 (A)  projected a cost to the state; and
 (B)  were attached to bills or resolutions that
 took effect; and
 (2)  develop a system to determine the actual cost to
 the state associated with a bill or resolution that took effect.
 (c)  Not later than September 1, 2018, the State Auditor
 shall deliver the results of the study conducted under this section
 to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house
 of representatives, the House Appropriations Committee, and the
 Senate Finance Committee.
 (d)  This section expires December 31, 2018.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *