House | 05/17/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 3537 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 3484 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3484 | |
House | 04/26/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1976 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1357 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 171 | |
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 171 | |
Senate | 12/21/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/21/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |