Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB400 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 400
 (In the Senate - Filed December 21, 2016; February 1, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
 Economic Development; April 12, 2017, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 10,
 Nays 0; April 12, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 400 By:  Burton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the verification of information provided to the
 comptroller and contained in reports on compliance with agreements
 under the Texas Economic Development Act.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 313.032(c), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (c)  The portion of the report described by Subsection (a)(2)
 must be based on data certified to the comptroller by each recipient
 or former recipient of a limitation on appraised value under this
 chapter. The recipient or former recipient shall contract with an
 independent certified public accountant to verify the data
 certified to the comptroller.  The data may be verified using
 information from any reliable source, including the Texas Workforce
 Commission and the chief appraiser of the applicable appraisal
 district.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *