House | 04/18/2017 | Referred to Government Transparency & Operation | Journal Page: 1572 | |
House | 04/18/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1572 | |
House | 03/29/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 939 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Remarks ordered printed | Journal Page: 725 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 725 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 725 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 725 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 725 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 725 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 725 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 724 | |
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 714 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 681 | |
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/20/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 576 | |
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 309 | |
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 279 | |
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 171 | |
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 171 | |
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 175 | |
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 99 | |
Senate | 01/18/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 42 | |
Senate | 01/03/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/03/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |