Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB407 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Watson, et al. S.B. No. 407
 (In the Senate - Filed January 3, 2017; February 1, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 March 20, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 2; March 20, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 407 By:  Creighton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the exception from disclosure under the public
 information law for information related to competition or bidding.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 552.104, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 552.104.  EXCEPTION:  INFORMATION RELATED TO
 COMPETITION OR BIDDING.  (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (c),
 information [Information] is excepted from the requirements of
 Section 552.021 if a governmental body demonstrates that release of
 the [it is] information [that, if released,] would harm its
 interests by providing an [give] advantage to a competitor or
 bidder in a particular competitive situation.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), the [The]
 requirement of Section 552.022 that a category of information
 listed under Section 552.022(a) is public information and not
 excepted from required disclosure under this chapter unless
 expressly confidential under law does not apply to information that
 is excepted from required disclosure under this section.
 (c)  The exception to disclosure provided by Subsection (a)
 does not apply to:
 (1)  a bid or proposal, or information contained in a
 bid or proposal, after the governmental body executes or awards the
 contract to which the bid or proposal relates; or
 (2)  an account, voucher, or contract, or information
 contained in or describing an account, voucher, or contract.
 (d)  Section 552.305 does not apply to the exception under
 this section.
 SECTION 2.  Section 552.305(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  In a case in which information is requested under this
 chapter and a person's privacy or property interests may be
 involved, including a case under Section 552.101, [552.104,]
 552.110, or 552.114, a governmental body may decline to release the
 information for the purpose of requesting an attorney general
 decision.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a request for information received by a governmental body or an
 officer for public information on or after the effective date of
 this Act.  A request for information received before the effective
 date of this Act is governed by the law in effect when the request
 was received, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *