Senate | 05/19/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 958 | |
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 831 | |
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/08/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 182 | |
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 182 | |
Senate | 01/06/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/06/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |