Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB430 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Rodríguez, Burton S.B. No. 430
22 (In the Senate - Filed January 6, 2017; February 6, 2017,
33 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
44 Services; April 10, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
55 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 1;
66 April 10, 2017, sent to printer.)
77 Click here to see the committee vote
88 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 430 By: Watson
99
1010
1111 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1212 AN ACT
1313 relating to the regulation of the practice of dental hygiene.
1414 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1515 SECTION 1. Section 258.001, Occupations Code, is amended to
1616 read as follows:
1717 Sec. 258.001. [IMPERMISSIBLE] DELEGATIONS. (a) A dentist
1818 may not delegate:
1919 (1) an act to an individual who, by board order, is
2020 prohibited from performing the act;
2121 (2) any of the following acts to a person not licensed
2222 as a dentist or dental hygienist:
2323 (A) the removal of calculus, deposits, or
2424 accretions from the natural and restored surfaces of exposed human
2525 teeth and restorations in the human mouth;
2626 (B) root planing or the smoothing and polishing
2727 of roughened root surfaces or exposed human teeth; or
2828 (C) any other act the delegation of which is
2929 prohibited by board rule; or
3030 (3) any of the following acts to a person not licensed
3131 as a dentist:
3232 (A) comprehensive examination or diagnosis and
3333 treatment planning;
3434 (B) a surgical or cutting procedure on hard or
3535 soft tissue;
3636 (C) the prescription of a drug, medication, or
3737 work authorization;
3838 (D) the taking of an impression for a final
3939 restoration, appliance, or prosthesis;
4040 (E) the making of an intraoral occlusal
4141 adjustment;
4242 (F) direct pulp capping, pulpotomy, or any other
4343 endodontic procedure;
4444 (G) the final placement and intraoral adjustment
4545 of a fixed or removable appliance; or
4646 (H) the placement of any final restoration.
4747 (b) A dentist may delegate[; or
4848 [(4)] the authority to an individual to administer a
4949 local anesthetic agent, inhalation sedative agent, parenteral
5050 sedative agent, or general anesthetic agent if the individual is
5151 [not] licensed as:
5252 (1) [(A)] a dentist, with a permit issued by the board
5353 for the procedure being performed[,] if a permit is required;
5454 (2) [(B)] a certified registered nurse anesthetist
5555 licensed by the Texas Board of Nursing, only if the delegating
5656 dentist holds a permit issued by the board for the procedure being
5757 performed[,] if a permit is required; [or]
5858 (3) [(C)] a physician anesthesiologist licensed by
5959 the Texas Medical Board; or
6060 (4) a dental hygienist, only if:
6161 (A) the procedure is the administration of a
6262 local anesthetic agent under Section 262.002(a)(6);
6363 (B) the dental hygienist has passed a
6464 certification examination approved by the board; and
6565 (C) the dental hygienist:
6666 (i) has completed a course approved by the
6767 board to train dental hygienists to administer local anesthetic
6868 agents; or
6969 (ii) has been licensed in good standing
7070 within the past year to administer local anesthetic agents:
7171 (a) by a branch of the United States
7272 armed forces; or
7373 (b) by another state.
7474 SECTION 2. Section 262.002(a), Occupations Code, is amended
7575 to read as follows:
7676 (a) A person practices dental hygiene if the person:
7777 (1) removes accumulated matter, tartar, deposits,
7878 accretions, or stains, other than mottled enamel stains, from the
7979 natural and restored surface of exposed human teeth and
8080 restorations in the human mouth;
8181 (2) smoothes roughened root surfaces;
8282 (3) polishes exposed human teeth, restorations in the
8383 human mouth, or roughened root surfaces;
8484 (4) topically applies drugs to the surface tissues of
8585 the human mouth or the exposed surface of human teeth;
8686 (5) makes dental x-rays; [and]
8787 (6) administers infiltration anesthesia under the
8888 authorization and direct supervision of a dentist; and
8989 (7) performs any other service, task, or procedure
9090 prescribed by board rule.
9191 SECTION 3. (a) The State Board of Dental Examiners, not
9292 later than January 1, 2018, shall:
9393 (1) prescribe by rule the requirements for a course to
9494 train dental hygienists to administer local anesthetic agents; and
9595 (2) develop a procedure for the approval of courses
9696 described by Subdivision (1) of this subsection.
9797 (b) A rule adopted under Subsection (a) of this section must
9898 require that a course be offered in a classroom setting at an
9999 educational institution accredited by the Commission on Dental
100100 Accreditation of the American Dental Association.
101101 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
102102 * * * * *