1 | 1 | | By: Garcia, RodrÃguez S.B. No. 462 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed January 11, 2017; February 6, 2017, |
---|
3 | 3 | | read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources & |
---|
4 | 4 | | Economic Development; May 3, 2017, reported favorably by the |
---|
5 | 5 | | following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 3; May 3, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 11 | | relating to a database of employers penalized for failure to pay |
---|
12 | 12 | | wages or convicted of certain offenses involving wage theft. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 301, Labor Code, is |
---|
15 | 15 | | amended by adding Section 301.070 to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | Sec. 301.070. DATABASE REGARDING WAGE THEFT. (a) In this |
---|
17 | 17 | | section: |
---|
18 | 18 | | (1) "Attorney representing the state" means a district |
---|
19 | 19 | | attorney, criminal district attorney, or county attorney |
---|
20 | 20 | | performing the duties of a district attorney. |
---|
21 | 21 | | (2) "Employee" and "employer" have the meanings |
---|
22 | 22 | | assigned by Section 61.001. |
---|
23 | 23 | | (b) The commission shall make available on its Internet |
---|
24 | 24 | | website a publicly accessible list of all employers in this state |
---|
25 | 25 | | that have been: |
---|
26 | 26 | | (1) assessed an administrative penalty under Section |
---|
27 | 27 | | 61.053; |
---|
28 | 28 | | (2) ordered to pay wages by a final order of the |
---|
29 | 29 | | commission and have failed to comply with Section 61.063; or |
---|
30 | 30 | | (3) convicted of an offense under: |
---|
31 | 31 | | (A) Section 61.019; or |
---|
32 | 32 | | (B) Section 31.04, Penal Code, if the offense |
---|
33 | 33 | | involved the theft of a service that was rendered by an employee of |
---|
34 | 34 | | the employer. |
---|
35 | 35 | | (c) For an employer that is a business entity, the database |
---|
36 | 36 | | must include the name under which the entity operates and the name |
---|
37 | 37 | | of each individual who is an owner of the entity and actively |
---|
38 | 38 | | involved in the management of the entity. |
---|
39 | 39 | | (d) The commission must provide notice to an employer not |
---|
40 | 40 | | later than the 180th day before the date the employer is listed in |
---|
41 | 41 | | the database. |
---|
42 | 42 | | (e) The commission by rule shall establish a process by |
---|
43 | 43 | | which an employer may, at any time after receiving notice under |
---|
44 | 44 | | Subsection (d), dispute the employer's inclusion in the database. |
---|
45 | 45 | | The process must require the commission to investigate and make a |
---|
46 | 46 | | final determination regarding an employer dispute under this |
---|
47 | 47 | | subsection not later than the 21st day after the date the dispute is |
---|
48 | 48 | | filed. |
---|
49 | 49 | | (f) The commission shall list an employer in the database |
---|
50 | 50 | | until the third anniversary of the date the penalty is assessed or |
---|
51 | 51 | | the employer is convicted. |
---|
52 | 52 | | (g) An attorney representing the state shall report to the |
---|
53 | 53 | | commission the name of each employer that is prosecuted and |
---|
54 | 54 | | convicted in the attorney's jurisdiction of an offense described by |
---|
55 | 55 | | Subsection (b)(3). |
---|
56 | 56 | | (h) For purposes of this section, a person has been |
---|
57 | 57 | | convicted of an offense if the person was adjudged guilty of the |
---|
58 | 58 | | offense or entered a plea of guilty or nolo contendere in return for |
---|
59 | 59 | | a grant of deferred adjudication community supervision, regardless |
---|
60 | 60 | | of whether the sentence for the offense was ever imposed or whether |
---|
61 | 61 | | the sentence was probated and the person was subsequently |
---|
62 | 62 | | discharged from community supervision. |
---|
63 | 63 | | (i) This section does not impose any additional requirement |
---|
64 | 64 | | on a contractor performing work under a contract that is subject to: |
---|
65 | 65 | | (1) Chapter 2258, Government Code; or |
---|
66 | 66 | | (2) the Davis-Bacon Act (40 U.S.C. Section 3141 et |
---|
67 | 67 | | seq.) or another federal law that makes the Davis-Bacon Act |
---|
68 | 68 | | applicable to the contract. |
---|
69 | 69 | | SECTION 2. (a) The change in law made by this Act applies |
---|
70 | 70 | | only to an administrative penalty assessed on or after the |
---|
71 | 71 | | effective date of this Act. An administrative penalty assessed |
---|
72 | 72 | | before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in |
---|
73 | 73 | | effect on the date the penalty was assessed, and the former law is |
---|
74 | 74 | | continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
75 | 75 | | (b) The change in law made by this Act applies only to a |
---|
76 | 76 | | criminal proceeding that commences on or after the effective date |
---|
77 | 77 | | of this Act. A criminal proceeding that commences before the |
---|
78 | 78 | | effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the |
---|
79 | 79 | | date the proceeding commenced, and the former law is continued in |
---|
80 | 80 | | effect for that purpose. |
---|
81 | 81 | | (c) The change in law made by this Act applies only to a |
---|
82 | 82 | | final order of the Texas Workforce Commission entered on or after |
---|
83 | 83 | | the effective date of this Act. A final order entered before the |
---|
84 | 84 | | effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the |
---|
85 | 85 | | date the order was entered, and the former law is continued in |
---|
86 | 86 | | effect for that purpose. |
---|
87 | 87 | | SECTION 3. Not later than December 1, 2017, the Texas |
---|
88 | 88 | | Workforce Commission shall establish the database required by |
---|
89 | 89 | | Section 301.070, Labor Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
90 | 90 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
91 | 91 | | * * * * * |
---|