Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB462 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Garcia, Rodríguez S.B. No. 462
 (In the Senate - Filed January 11, 2017; February 6, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
 Economic Development; May 3, 2017, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 3; May 3, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a database of employers penalized for failure to pay
 wages or convicted of certain offenses involving wage theft.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 301, Labor Code, is
 amended by adding Section 301.070 to read as follows:
 Sec. 301.070.  DATABASE REGARDING WAGE THEFT. (a)  In this
 section:
 (1)  "Attorney representing the state" means a district
 attorney, criminal district attorney, or county attorney
 performing the duties of a district attorney.
 (2)  "Employee" and "employer" have the meanings
 assigned by Section 61.001.
 (b)  The commission shall make available on its Internet
 website a publicly accessible list of all employers in this state
 that have been:
 (1)  assessed an administrative penalty under Section
 61.053;
 (2)  ordered to pay wages by a final order of the
 commission and have failed to comply with Section 61.063; or
 (3)  convicted of an offense under:
 (A)  Section 61.019; or
 (B)  Section 31.04, Penal Code, if the offense
 involved the theft of a service that was rendered by an employee of
 the employer.
 (c)  For an employer that is a business entity, the database
 must include the name under which the entity operates and the name
 of each individual who is an owner of the entity and actively
 involved in the management of the entity.
 (d)  The commission must provide notice to an employer not
 later than the 180th day before the date the employer is listed in
 the database.
 (e)  The commission by rule shall establish a process by
 which an employer may, at any time after receiving notice under
 Subsection (d), dispute the employer's inclusion in the database.
 The process must require the commission to investigate and make a
 final determination regarding an employer dispute under this
 subsection not later than the 21st day after the date the dispute is
 filed.
 (f)  The commission shall list an employer in the database
 until the third anniversary of the date the penalty is assessed or
 the employer is convicted.
 (g)  An attorney representing the state shall report to the
 commission the name of each employer that is prosecuted and
 convicted in the attorney's jurisdiction of an offense described by
 Subsection (b)(3).
 (h)  For purposes of this section, a person has been
 convicted of an offense if the person was adjudged guilty of the
 offense or entered a plea of guilty or nolo contendere in return for
 a grant of deferred adjudication community supervision, regardless
 of whether the sentence for the offense was ever imposed or whether
 the sentence was probated and the person was subsequently
 discharged from community supervision.
 (i)  This section does not impose any additional requirement
 on a contractor performing work under a contract that is subject to:
 (1)  Chapter 2258, Government Code; or
 (2)  the Davis-Bacon Act (40 U.S.C. Section 3141 et
 seq.) or another federal law that makes the Davis-Bacon Act
 applicable to the contract.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  The change in law made by this Act applies
 only to an administrative penalty assessed on or after the
 effective date of this Act.  An administrative penalty assessed
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the penalty was assessed, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 (b)  The change in law made by this Act applies only to a
 criminal proceeding that commences on or after the effective date
 of this Act.  A criminal proceeding that commences before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the proceeding commenced, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 (c)  The change in law made by this Act applies only to a
 final order of the Texas Workforce Commission entered on or after
 the effective date of this Act. A final order entered before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the order was entered, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than December 1, 2017, the Texas
 Workforce Commission shall establish the database required by
 Section 301.070, Labor Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *