E | 05/28/2017 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/28/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4213 | |
E | 05/22/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2574 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4358 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2478 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2449 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2140 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3791 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Record vote | RV#1360 | Journal Page: 3790 |
House | 05/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3790 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3790 | |
House | 05/18/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3717 | |
House | 05/18/2017 | Record vote | RV#1340 | Journal Page: 3716 |
House | 05/18/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3716 | |
House | 05/18/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3716 | |
House | 05/18/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/12/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3492 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1684 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1178 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1025 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1025 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1025 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1025 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1025 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1025 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1142 | |
Senate | 04/11/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 921 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 187 | |
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 187 | |
Senate | 01/13/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/13/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |