E | 05/04/2017 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/04/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1688 | |
E | 04/25/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1288 | |
House | 04/25/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1840 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1265 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1288 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1237 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1713 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1712 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Record vote | RV#322 | Journal Page: 1713 |
House | 04/20/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1713 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1713 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1692 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1692 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 598 | Journal Page: 1692 |
House | 04/20/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1803 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2017 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 1508 | |
House | 04/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1508 | |
House | 03/28/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 913 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 722 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 722 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 722 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 722 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 722 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 722 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 722 | |
Senate | 03/22/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 417 | |
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 187 | |
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 187 | |
Senate | 01/17/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/17/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |