Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB492 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill January 17, 2017

House Committee Report

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 28, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill April 24, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2017
Bill March 6, 2017