Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB496 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Uresti S.B. No. 496
 (In the Senate - Filed January 17, 2017; February 6, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 27, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 27, 2017,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 496 By:  Bettencourt


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the participation of the school of osteopathic medicine
 at the University of the Incarnate Word in certain state programs
 supporting graduate medical education programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 58.006, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (d) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  An organization eligible to receive funds under this
 subsection must:
 (1)  qualify for exemption from federal income tax
 under Section 501, Internal Revenue Code of 1986 (26 U.S.C. Section
 501); or
 (2)  be operated by a state accredited medical school
 [as defined in Section 61.501(1)].
 (d)  For purposes of this section, "medical school" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 61.501(1), except that the term also
 includes the school of osteopathic medicine at the University of
 the Incarnate Word.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 58A, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 58A.0505 to read as follows:
 Sec. 58A.0505.  DEFINITION OF MEDICAL SCHOOL.  For purposes
 of this subchapter, "medical school" also includes the school of
 osteopathic medicine at the University of the Incarnate Word.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *