E
|
06/01/2017
|
Effective on 1/1/18
|
|
|
E
|
06/01/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4244
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4243
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4142
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5709
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1963
|
Journal Page: 5708
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5704
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 13, Section 9 and Rule 13, Section 11(a)
|
Journal Page: 5707
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6033
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3799
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3799
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3697
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees w/inst-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3570
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3570
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees with instructions
|
|
Journal Page: 5503
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Motion prevails
|
|
Journal Page: 5503
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Motion to instruct conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5503
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5503
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5093
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5093
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5093
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3304
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3304
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 3304
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3304
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3303
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2965
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1715
|
Journal Page: 4600
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4600
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4600
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4580
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4580
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4459
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1665
|
Journal Page: 4458
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4458
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
|
Journal Page: 4457
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Amendment as amended fails of adoption
|
29-E. Rodriguez
|
Journal Page: 4457
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Amendment amended
|
30-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 4457
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
29-E. Rodriguez
|
Journal Page: 4451
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
28-Alonzo
|
Journal Page: 4451
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Amended
|
26-J. Rodriguez
|
Journal Page: 4449
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
23-J. Rodriguez
|
Journal Page: 4445
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Amendment tabled
|
2-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 4430
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4430
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Placed on Emergency Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1803
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 1473
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1473
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 939
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 722
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 722
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 722
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 722
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 722
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 701
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 700
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 700
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 700
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA5 Rodrguez
|
Journal Page: 697
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 696
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 696
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 695
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 695
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 528
|
Senate
|
03/13/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 320
|
Senate
|
02/22/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 320
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|