LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB5
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB5
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB5
Compare Versions
SB5 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB5 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB5 Enrolled May 29, 2017
SB5 Comm Sub April 21, 2017
SB5 Engrossed March 28, 2017
SB5 Comm Sub March 14, 2017
SB5 Introduced February 21, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
SB5 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB5 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB5 Enrolled May 29, 2017
SB5 Comm Sub April 21, 2017
SB5 Engrossed March 28, 2017
SB5 Comm Sub March 14, 2017
SB5 Introduced February 21, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare