House | 05/12/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3456 | |
House | 05/10/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2187 | |
House | 05/01/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2187 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1701 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1228 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1180 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1180 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1180 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1180 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1180 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1180 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1180 | |
Senate | 04/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 921 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 94 | |
Senate | 01/24/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 94 | |
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/14/2016 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |