Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB56 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 56
 (In the Senate - Filed November 14, 2016; January 24, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 5, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; April 5, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the acknowledgment by management of risks identified in
 state agency information security plans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2054.133, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (e) to read as follows:
 (e)  Each state agency shall include in the agency's
 information security plan a written acknowledgment that the
 executive director or other head of the state agency, the chief
 financial officer, and each executive manager as designated by the
 state agency have been made aware of the risks revealed during the
 preparation of the agency's information security plan.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *