Senate | 04/05/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 921 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/08/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 253 | |
Senate | 02/08/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 253 | |
Senate | 01/20/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/20/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |