Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB562 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Hancock S.B. No. 562
22 (In the Senate - Filed January 20, 2017; February 8, 2017,
33 read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
44 April 5, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9,
55 Nays 0; April 5, 2017, sent to printer.)
66 Click here to see the committee vote
77
88
99 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1010 AN ACT
1111 relating to the provision of surplus lines insurance to certain
1212 commercial insureds.
1313 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1414 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 981, Insurance Code, is
1515 amended by adding Section 981.0033 to read as follows:
1616 Sec. 981.0033. INDUSTRIAL INSURED DEFINED. For purposes of
1717 this chapter, "industrial insured" means a person who purchases
1818 commercial insurance and, at the time of placement:
1919 (1) employs or retains a qualified risk manager to
2020 negotiate insurance coverage;
2121 (2) has paid aggregate nationwide commercial property
2222 and casualty insurance premiums of more than $25,000 in the
2323 immediately preceding 12 months; and
2424 (3) has at least 25 full-time employees.
2525 SECTION 2. Section 981.004, Insurance Code, is amended by
2626 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
2727 (d) Subsection (a)(1) does not apply to insurance procured
2828 for an industrial insured if:
2929 (1) the agent procuring or placing the insurance
3030 discloses to the industrial insured that:
3131 (A) comparable insurance may be available from
3232 the admitted market that is subject to more regulatory oversight
3333 than the surplus lines market; and
3434 (B) a policy purchased in the admitted market may
3535 provide greater protection than the surplus lines insurance policy;
3636 (2) the surplus lines company offering the coverage
3737 has a financial strength rating of A- or better from the A. M. Best
3838 Company; and
3939 (3) after receiving the notice described by
4040 Subdivision (1), the industrial insured requests in writing that
4141 the agent procure the insurance from or place the insurance with an
4242 eligible surplus lines insurer.
4343 SECTION 3. Section 981.215(a), Insurance Code, is amended
4444 to read as follows:
4545 (a) A surplus lines agent shall maintain a complete record
4646 of each surplus lines contract obtained by the agent, including any
4747 of the following, if applicable:
4848 (1) a copy of the daily report;
4949 (2) the amount of the insurance and risks insured
5050 against;
5151 (3) a brief general description of the property
5252 insured and the location of that property;
5353 (4) the gross premium charged;
5454 (5) the return premium paid;
5555 (6) the rate of premium charged on the different items
5656 of property;
5757 (7) the contract terms, including the effective date;
5858 (8) the insured's name and post office address;
5959 (9) the insurer's name and home office address;
6060 (10) the amount collected from the insured;
6161 (11) an agreement under Section 225.006(c);
6262 (12) evidence establishing that:
6363 (A) the insured qualified as an exempt commercial
6464 purchaser and that the surplus lines agent complied with the
6565 requirements of Section 981.004(c) if a diligent effort to obtain
6666 insurance in the admitted market was not made pursuant to Section
6767 981.004(a)(1); or
6868 (B) the insured qualified as an industrial
6969 insured and that the surplus lines agent complied with the
7070 requirements of Section 981.004(d) if a diligent effort to obtain
7171 insurance in the admitted market was not made pursuant to Section
7272 981.004(a)(1); and
7373 (13) any other information required by the department.
7474 SECTION 4. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
7575 an insurance policy delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on
7676 or after January 1, 2018. A policy delivered, issued for delivery,
7777 or renewed before January 1, 2018, is governed by the law as it
7878 existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that
7979 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
8080 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
8181 * * * * *