Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB568 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Rodríguez S.B. No. 568
 (In the Senate - Filed January 20, 2017; February 8, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
 Economic Development; April 27, 2017, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 2, 2 present not voting; April 27, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 568 By:  Rodríguez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the posting by the Railroad Commission of Texas on its
 Internet website of certain enforcement information.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 81, Natural Resources
 Code, is amended by adding Section 81.071 to read as follows:
 Sec. 81.071.  ENFORCEMENT INFORMATION. (a)  The commission
 shall post on the commission's Internet website:
 (1)  comprehensive information regarding the
 commission's enforcement of this title and rules, orders, licenses,
 permits, and certificates issued under this title, including
 information regarding:
 (A)  inspection and enforcement activity;
 (B)  violations; and
 (C)  the amount of penalties finally assessed;
 (2)  information evidencing quarterly trends regarding
 enforcement activity by the commission, including:
 (A)  the number of inspections conducted;
 (B)  the number of violations, categorized
 according to the degree of severity of the violation and the
 statute, rule, order, license, permit, or certificate violated, for
 which enforcement action has been taken;
 (C)  the number of repeat violations determined to
 have been committed; and
 (D)  the number of violations referred to the
 attorney general for enforcement; and
 (3)  an analysis of annual trends regarding enforcement
 activity by the commission.
 (b)  Information required to be posted under this section
 must be:
 (1)  in a searchable format;
 (2)  organized by county, by operator or other entity,
 and by well, if applicable; and
 (3)  capable of being downloaded in bulk.
 SECTION 2.  The Railroad Commission of Texas shall comply
 with Section 81.071(b), Natural Resources Code, as added by this
 Act, not later than January 1, 2019.
 SECTION 3.  The Railroad Commission of Texas shall implement
 Section 81.071, Natural Resources Code, as added by this Act, using
 only money that is appropriated to the commission by the General
 Appropriations Act for the state fiscal biennium beginning
 September 1, 2017, for public information and services and that is
 available to be spent for the publication on the commission's
 Internet website of information about the commission's inspection
 and enforcement activities. If the commission determines that it
 is not required to implement that statute because the legislature
 has not appropriated money available for that purpose, the
 commission shall notify the Legislative Budget Board of that
 determination.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *