E
|
05/26/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/26/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3699
|
E
|
05/18/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2113
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3742
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3744
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2113
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2056
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2056
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2056
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2055
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1921
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1248
|
Journal Page: 3438
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3438
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3438
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/12/17 8:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 3285
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3285
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3253
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3223
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Ashby
|
Journal Page: 3223
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3222
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 539
|
Journal Page: 3222
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3155
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2642
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2642
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1686
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1228
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1169
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1169
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1169
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1169
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1169
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1169
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1169
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 985
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
|
|
Journal Page: 256
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 256
|
Senate
|
01/24/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|