Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB587 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/17/2017

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 587


 AN ACT
 relating to the state virtual school network, including the ability
 of certain dependents of members of the United States military to
 enroll full-time in courses provided through the network.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 30A.002(b), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (b)  A student is eligible to enroll full-time in courses
 provided through the state virtual school network only if the
 student:
 (1)  was enrolled in a public school in this state in
 the preceding school year; [or]
 (2)  is a dependent of a member of the United States
 military who has been deployed or transferred to this state and was
 enrolled in a publicly funded school outside of this state in the
 preceding school year; or
 (3)  has been placed in substitute care in this state,
 regardless of whether the student was enrolled in a public school in
 this state in the preceding school year.
 SECTION 2.  Section 30A.052(c), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  The commissioner shall[:
 [(1)]  employ a limited number of administrative
 employees in connection with the network[; and
 [(2)     contract with a regional education service center
 for the service center to operate the network].
 SECTION 3.  This Act applies beginning with the 2017-2018
 school year.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 587 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendments on May 17, 2017, by the
 following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 587 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 12, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 142,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor