E
|
06/01/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/01/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4244
|
E
|
05/27/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5680
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3786
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3151
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4807
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1814
|
Journal Page: 4807
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4807
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4807
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4783
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4783
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3890
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2642
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2642
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1684
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1178
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1028
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1028
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1028
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1027
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1027
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1027
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1027
|
Senate
|
04/18/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1142
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 985
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 526
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
|
|
Journal Page: 256
|
Senate
|
02/08/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 256
|
Senate
|
01/24/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|