House
|
05/15/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3492
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1573
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1573
|
House
|
04/03/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1067
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 860
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 797
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 797
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 797
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 797
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 796
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 796
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 796
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
03/22/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2017
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 263
|
Senate
|
02/13/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 263
|
Senate
|
01/25/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|