Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB601 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill January 25, 2017

House Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill March 30, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 12, 2017
Bill March 27, 2017