Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB601 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/27/2017

                    By: Campbell S.B. No. 601
 (In the Senate - Filed January 25, 2017; February 13, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; March 27, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 2; March 27, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to authorizing an exemption for open-enrollment charter
 schools from certain municipal drainage requirements.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 552.053, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (b-1) and
 (b-2) to read as follows:
 (b)  The following may be exempt:
 (1)  this state;
 (2)  a county;
 (3)  a municipality; or
 (4)  [a] school districts and open-enrollment charter
 schools [district].
 (b-1)  For purposes of an exemption granted under Subsection
 (b)(4), the exemption must be granted to both school districts and
 open-enrollment charter schools.
 (b-2)  For purposes of this section, an "open-enrollment
 charter school" means a school granted a charter under Subchapter D
 or E, Chapter 12, Education Code.
 SECTION 2.  An exemption granted to a school district under
 Section 552.053(b)(4), Local Government Code, as that section
 existed before the effective date of this Act, automatically
 extends to all open-enrollment charter schools located in the
 municipality after the effective date of this Act unless the
 municipality repeals the exemption before the effective date of
 this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *