House | 05/18/2017 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 3742 | |
House | 05/18/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3742 | |
House | 05/17/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3664 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2072 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1999 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1999 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1999 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1999 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1999 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1999 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 1998 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Huffines | Journal Page: 1998 |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1998 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1998 | |
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/02/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1261 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/14/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 280 | |
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 263 | |
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 263 | |
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |