Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB610 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Huffines, Campbell S.B. No. 610
2- (In the Senate - Filed January 25, 2017; February 13, 2017,
3- read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
4- April 24, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5- Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 3; April 24, 2017,
6- sent to printer.)
7-Click here to see the committee vote
8- COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 610 By: Huffines
92
103
114 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
125 AN ACT
13- relating to the state virtual school network.
6+ relating to a study on expanding the state virtual school network.
147 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
15- SECTION 1. Section 30A.101(c), Education Code, is amended
16- to read as follows:
17- (c) A nonprofit entity, private entity, or corporation is
18- eligible to act as a course provider under this chapter only if the
19- nonprofit entity, private entity, or corporation:
20- (1) complies with all applicable federal and state
21- laws prohibiting discrimination;
22- (2) demonstrates financial solvency; and
23- (3) provides evidence of prior successful experience
24- offering online courses to kindergarten or elementary, middle, or
25- high school students, with demonstrated student success in course
26- completion and performance, as determined by the commissioner.
27- SECTION 2. Section 30A.104(a), Education Code, is amended
28- to read as follows:
29- (a) A course offered through the state virtual school
30- network must:
31- (1) be in a specific subject that is part of the
32- required curriculum under Section 28.002(a);
33- (2) be aligned with the essential knowledge and skills
34- identified under Section 28.002(c) for a grade level at or above
35- kindergarten [grade level three]; and
36- (3) be the equivalent in instructional rigor and scope
37- to a course that is provided in a traditional classroom setting
38- during:
39- (A) a semester of 90 instructional days; and
40- (B) a school day that meets the minimum length of
41- a school day required under Section 25.082.
42- SECTION 3. Section 30A.151(f), Education Code, is amended
43- to read as follows:
44- (f) For a full-time electronic course program offered
45- through the state virtual school network for a grade level at or
46- above kindergarten [grade level three] but not above grade level
47- eight, a school district or open-enrollment charter school is
48- entitled to receive federal, state, and local funding for a student
49- enrolled in the program in an amount equal to the funding the
50- district or school would otherwise receive for a student enrolled
51- in the district or school. The district or school may calculate the
52- average daily attendance of a student enrolled in the program based
53- on:
54- (1) hours of contact with the student;
55- (2) the student's successful completion of a course;
56- or
57- (3) a method approved by the commissioner.
58- SECTION 4. This Act applies beginning with the 2017-2018
59- school year.
60- SECTION 5. This Act takes effect only if a specific
61- appropriation for the implementation of the Act is provided in a
62- general appropriations act of the 85th Legislature.
63- SECTION 6. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
8+ SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 30A, Education Code, is
9+ amended by adding Section 30A.116 to read as follows:
10+ Sec. 30A.116. STUDY ON EXPANSION TO CERTAIN GRADE LEVELS.
11+ (a) The agency, using existing resources, shall conduct a study
12+ regarding the feasibility of offering a full-time electronic course
13+ program for a grade level at or above kindergarten and below grade
14+ level three. The study must consider:
15+ (1) whether offering courses through the virtual
16+ school network to students in those grade levels is appropriate;
17+ and
18+ (2) the academic impact on students in those grade
19+ levels of offering courses through the virtual school network to
20+ those students.
21+ (b) Not later than September 1, 2018, the agency shall
22+ submit to the commissioner and each legislative standing committee
23+ with primary jurisdiction over public education a report that
24+ includes:
25+ (1) the results of the study conducted under this
26+ section; and
27+ (2) recommendations regarding offering courses
28+ through the virtual school network to students in a grade level at
29+ or above kindergarten and below grade level three.
30+ (c) This section expires January 1, 2019.
31+ SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
6432 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
6533 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
6634 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
6735 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
68- * * * * *