E | 05/22/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 05/22/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2574 | |
E | 05/11/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1904 | |
House | 05/11/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3385 | |
Senate | 05/11/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1876 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1904 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1790 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Record vote | RV#1049 | Journal Page: 3061 |
House | 05/09/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 3061 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3061 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3034 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3034 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1354 | Journal Page: 3034 |
House | 05/06/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2885 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2294 | |
House | 05/02/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2294 | |
House | 04/26/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1974 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1321 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1269 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1269 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1269 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1268 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1268 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1268 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 1268 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Rodrguez | Journal Page: 1268 |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1268 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1268 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 264 | |
Senate | 02/13/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 264 | |
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/25/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |