Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB619 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 85R4759 SCL/TJB-D
22 By: Estes S.B. No. 619
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to county and municipal cooperation with state and federal
88 immigration law enforcement and efforts to enhance international
99 border security.
1010 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1111 SECTION 1. Subtitle C, Title 11, Local Government Code, is
1212 amended by adding Chapter 364 to read as follows:
1313 CHAPTER 364. STATE AND FEDERAL IMMIGRATION LAW ENFORCEMENT AND
1414 ENHANCEMENT OF INTERNATIONAL BORDER SECURITY
1515 Sec. 364.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
1616 (1) "Immigration detainer request" means a United
1717 States Department of Homeland Security Form I-247 or a similar or
1818 successor form that requests a local entity to maintain temporary
1919 custody of an alien for the federal government.
2020 (2) "Immigration laws" means the laws of this state or
2121 federal law relating to immigrants or immigration, including the
2222 federal Immigration and Nationality Act (8 U.S.C. Section 1101 et
2323 seq.).
2424 Sec. 364.002. IMMIGRATION AND BORDER SECURITY ORDER OR
2525 ORDINANCE REQUIRED; COMPTROLLER DATABASE. (a) The commissioners
2626 court of each county and the governing body of each municipality in
2727 this state shall:
2828 (1) adopt and enforce an order or ordinance, as
2929 appropriate, that requires the county or municipality to cooperate
3030 with:
3131 (A) state and federal law enforcement in
3232 enforcing immigration laws; and
3333 (B) for counties containing an international
3434 border and municipalities located wholly or partly in those
3535 counties, state and federal efforts to enhance international border
3636 security; and
3737 (2) submit a written copy of the order or ordinance to
3838 the comptroller.
3939 (b) The comptroller shall establish and maintain a database
4040 of counties and municipalities that comply with this section.
4141 Sec. 364.003. COMPLAINT; EQUITABLE RELIEF. (a) Any
4242 person, including the federal government, may file a complaint with
4343 the attorney general if the person offers evidence to support an
4444 allegation that a county or municipality has failed to comply with
4545 Section 364.002. The person must include with the complaint the
4646 evidence the person has that supports the complaint.
4747 (b) A county or municipality for which the attorney general
4848 has received a complaint under Subsection (a) shall comply with a
4949 document request, including a request for supporting documents,
5050 from the attorney general related to the complaint.
5151 (c) If the attorney general determines that a complaint
5252 filed under Subsection (a) against a county or municipality is
5353 valid, the attorney general shall, not later than the 10th day after
5454 the date of the determination, provide written notification to the
5555 county or municipality that:
5656 (1) the complaint has been filed;
5757 (2) the attorney general has determined that the
5858 complaint is valid;
5959 (3) the attorney general is authorized to file an
6060 action to enjoin the violation if the county or municipality does
6161 not come into compliance with the requirements of Section 364.002
6262 on or before the 90th day after the date the notification is
6363 provided; and
6464 (4) the authority of the county or municipality to
6565 impose a sales or use tax will be suspended as provided by Section
6666 364.004 if the county or municipality is finally determined under
6767 Subsection (e) to have failed to adopt, submit to the comptroller,
6868 or enforce an order or ordinance required by Section 364.002.
6969 (d) Not later than the 30th day after the day a county or
7070 municipality receives written notification under Subsection (c),
7171 the county or municipality shall provide the attorney general with
7272 a copy of:
7373 (1) the county's or municipality's written policies
7474 related to immigration enforcement actions and international
7575 border security efforts, if applicable;
7676 (2) each immigration detainer request received by the
7777 county or municipality from the United States Department of
7878 Homeland Security; and
7979 (3) each response sent by the county or municipality
8080 for a detainer request described by Subdivision (2).
8181 (e) If the attorney general determines that a complaint
8282 filed under Subsection (a) against a county or municipality is
8383 valid, the attorney general may file a petition for a writ of
8484 mandamus or apply for other appropriate equitable relief in a
8585 district court in Travis County or in a county in which the
8686 principal office of the county or municipality is located to compel
8787 the county or municipality that fails to comply with Section
8888 364.002 to comply with that section. The attorney general may
8989 recover reasonable expenses incurred in obtaining relief under this
9090 subsection, including court costs, reasonable attorney's fees,
9191 investigative costs, witness fees, and deposition costs.
9292 (f) An appeal of a suit brought under Subsection (e) is
9393 governed by the procedures for accelerated appeals in civil cases
9494 under the Texas Rules of Appellate Procedure. The appellate court
9595 shall render its final order or judgment with the least possible
9696 delay.
9797 Sec. 364.004. SUSPENSION OF AUTHORITY TO IMPOSE SALES AND
9898 USE TAXES. (a) This section applies only to a county or
9999 municipality that is finally determined in an action filed under
100100 Section 364.003(e) to have failed to adopt, submit to the
101101 comptroller, or enforce an order or ordinance required by Section
102102 364.002.
103103 (b) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the
104104 authority of a county or municipality to which this section applies
105105 to impose a sales or use tax under Chapter 321 or 323, Tax Code, as
106106 applicable, and any other sales or use tax the county or
107107 municipality is otherwise authorized to impose is suspended, and
108108 the tax may not be collected during the period prescribed by
109109 Subsection (c).
110110 (c) A suspension under Subsection (b) of the authority to
111111 impose a sales or use tax is for a period of one year beginning on
112112 the first day of the first calendar quarter that begins after the
113113 30th day after the date a court issues the order or judgment making
114114 the final determination described by Subsection (a).
115115 (d) Notwithstanding a suspension of the authority of a
116116 county or municipality to impose a sales or use tax under this
117117 section, the tax continues during the suspension period to be
118118 considered as being imposed for purposes of determining the
119119 combined rate of all sales and use taxes imposed by all political
120120 subdivisions having territory in the county or municipality.
121121 (e) The comptroller may adopt rules necessary to implement
122122 this section, including rules for providing notice of a suspension
123123 of taxing authority under this section to retailers engaged in
124124 business in the affected county or municipality.
125125 SECTION 2. (a) Not later than October 1, 2017, the
126126 commissioners court of each county in this state and the governing
127127 body of each municipality in this state shall adopt an order or
128128 ordinance described by Section 364.002, Local Government Code, as
129129 added by this Act.
130130 (b) Not later than January 1, 2018, the commissioners court
131131 of each county in this state and the governing body of each
132132 municipality in this state shall submit to the comptroller of
133133 public accounts a copy of the order or ordinance adopted under
134134 Section 364.002, Local Government Code, as added by this Act.
135135 (c) Not later than December 1, 2018, the comptroller of
136136 public accounts shall submit a written report to the legislature on
137137 the counties and municipalities that have failed to adopt an order
138138 or ordinance under Section 364.002, Local Government Code, as added
139139 by this Act.
140140 SECTION 3. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b), this
141141 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
142142 (b) Section 364.003, Local Government Code, as added by this
143143 Act, takes effect November 1, 2017.