Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB64 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 64
 (In the Senate - Filed November 14, 2016; January 24, 2017,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 11, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 1; April 11, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to recording of minutes for a local canvassing authority.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 67.004, Election Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  The presiding officer of the canvassing authority shall
 note the completion of the canvass in the minutes or in the
 recording required by Section 551.021, Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *