Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB658 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill January 30, 2017

House Committee Report

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill March 22, 2017

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 11, 2017
Bill March 6, 2017