House | 05/21/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/20/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4175 | |
House | 05/18/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/15/2017 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 3485 | |
House | 05/15/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3485 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2508 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1732 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1630 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1630 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1630 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1630 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1630 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1630 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1630 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1624 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1261 | |
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 290 | |
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 290 | |
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/30/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |