House | 05/20/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/20/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4175 | |
House | 05/19/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 2642 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2642 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1684 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1178 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1032 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1032 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1032 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1032 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1032 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1032 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Amended | Journal Page: 1032 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Miles | Journal Page: 1032 |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1032 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1032 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 958 | |
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/04/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/27/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 341 | |
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 291 | |
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 291 | |
Senate | 01/31/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/31/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |