Senate | 04/24/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 860 | |
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 292 | |
Senate | 02/15/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 292 | |
Senate | 01/31/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/31/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |