E | 05/29/2017 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/29/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4243 | |
E | 05/24/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3141 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4566 | |
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2605 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2880 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2493 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4199 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Record vote | RV#1553 | Journal Page: 4199 |
House | 05/22/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 4199 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4199 | |
House | 05/21/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4108 | |
House | 05/21/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4108 | |
House | 05/21/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 05/18/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3746 | |
House | 05/17/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/17/2017 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Referred to General Investigating & Ethics | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 03/30/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1031 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 833 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 757 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 757 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 757 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 757 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 757 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 757 | |
Senate | 03/29/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 757 | |
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 717 | |
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Referred to Nominations | Journal Page: 303 | |
Senate | 02/21/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 303 | |
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/01/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |