E
|
06/09/2017
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4244
|
E
|
05/28/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4213
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3699
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5093
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3296
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3296
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3296
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3293
|
Senate
|
05/21/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2245
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1435
|
Journal Page: 3917
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3917
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3917
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Bernal, Huberty, Minjarez, S. Thompson, and Meyer
|
Journal Page: 3916
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3916
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/20/17 11:45 AM
|
Journal Page: 3912
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3911
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3862
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Stickland
|
Journal Page: 3862
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3861
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/19/17 8:17 PM
|
Journal Page: 3857
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 3857
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3856
|
House
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3606
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2454
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2454
|
House
|
04/20/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1703
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1228
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1183
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1183
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1183
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1183
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1183
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1183
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1183
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1175
|
Senate
|
04/12/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1005
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 985
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 305
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 305
|
Senate
|
02/03/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|