LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB725
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB725
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB725
Compare Versions
SB725 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB725 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB725 Enrolled May 25, 2017
SB725 Comm Sub May 15, 2017
SB725 Engrossed April 19, 2017
SB725 Comm Sub April 11, 2017
SB725 Introduced February 3, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
SB725 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB725 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB725 Enrolled May 25, 2017
SB725 Comm Sub May 15, 2017
SB725 Engrossed April 19, 2017
SB725 Comm Sub April 11, 2017
SB725 Introduced February 3, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare