E
|
06/15/2017
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4246
|
E
|
05/27/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5680
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3786
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4076
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5566
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3372
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3372
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3372
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3372
|
Senate
|
05/23/2017
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2625
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4421
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1645
|
Journal Page: 4421
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4421
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Phelan
|
Journal Page: 4421
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4420
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/23/17 12:13 PM
|
Journal Page: 4411
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4411
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4315
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Darby
|
Journal Page: 4315
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4315
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3890
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 3485
|
House
|
05/15/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 3485
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1422
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 933
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 903
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 903
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 903
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 902
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 902
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 902
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Kolkhorst
|
Journal Page: 902
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 902
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 902
|
Senate
|
04/05/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 901
|
Senate
|
04/04/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 858
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 833
|
Senate
|
03/29/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2017
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 394
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 307
|
Senate
|
02/21/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 307
|
Senate
|
02/03/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2017
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|