LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2017 - 85th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB744
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB744
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2017 - 85th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB744
Compare Versions
SB744 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB744 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB744 Enrolled May 26, 2017
SB744 Comm Sub May 18, 2017
SB744 Engrossed April 5, 2017
SB744 Comm Sub March 30, 2017
SB744 Introduced February 3, 2017
Version 1 (Old)
SB744 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB744 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB744 Enrolled May 26, 2017
SB744 Comm Sub May 18, 2017
SB744 Engrossed April 5, 2017
SB744 Comm Sub March 30, 2017
SB744 Introduced February 3, 2017
Version 2 (New)
Compare