E | 05/18/2017 | Effective on 9/1/17 | ||
E | 05/18/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2113 | |
E | 05/08/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1732 | |
House | 05/08/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3022 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1722 | |
Senate | 05/05/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1732 | |
Senate | 05/05/2017 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1682 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Record vote | RV#738 | Journal Page: 2525 |
House | 05/04/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2525 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2525 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2374 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2374 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2374 | |
House | 05/03/2017 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2417 | Journal Page: 2374 |
House | 04/28/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2125 | |
House | 04/25/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 1473 | |
House | 04/12/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1473 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1087 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 895 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 838 | |
Senate | 04/03/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 684 | |
Senate | 03/21/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/14/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 321 | |
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 321 | |
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |