House | 05/12/2017 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 3383 | |
House | 05/12/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3383 | |
House | 05/09/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3153 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1828 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1739 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1739 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1739 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1739 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1764 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1720 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Garcia | Journal Page: 1720 |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1720 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Amendment fails of adoption | Journal Page: 1720 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1720 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1719 | |
Senate | 05/04/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1321 | |
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/24/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 322 | |
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 322 | |
Senate | 02/07/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |