House | 05/20/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/19/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4004 | |
House | 05/16/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/16/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 04/26/2017 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1980 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1357 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1301 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1301 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1301 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1301 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1301 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1301 | |
Senate | 04/26/2017 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1301 | |
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1227 | |
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/18/2017 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1141 | |
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 322 | |
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 322 | |
Senate | 02/07/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |