Senate | 05/02/2017 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2017 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 04/12/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 323 | |
Senate | 02/22/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 323 | |
Senate | 02/08/2017 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2017 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |